WESTMORLAND YOUTH ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WYO provides weekly term-time training in orchestral playing and the presentation of public concerts for young people under the age of 19, who are ordinarily resident in the former county of Westmorland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £4,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER WATES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yvonne Hulme | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|||||
David Hugh Ozanne | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN WALTER JONES | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Ursula Jane Leveaux | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorthe Pratt | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JANE LOWTHIAN | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lucy Davies | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.37k | £108.30k | £14.85k | £27.62k | £18.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.07k | £38.67k | £29.28k | £33.31k | £38.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.50k | £5.30k | £5.30k | £5.13k | £4.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 July 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 July 2020 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1994 AMENDED 5 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION PRIMARILY OF THOSE YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 19 WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT, OR RECEIVE THEIR EDUCATION, WITHIN THE AREA OF THE FORMER ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF WESTMORLAND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN ORCHESTRAL PLAYING AND THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALLBE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
FORMER ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF WESTMORLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle Street Centre
Castle Street
KENDAL
LA9 7AD
- Phone:
- 01539443183
- Email:
- admin@wyo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window