Financial history WOLBOROUGH ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1077386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £72.14k £72.68k £79.48k £65.91k £69.66k
Total expenditure £74.73k £113.13k £103.78k £84.77k £74.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A