Trustees INDIAN QUEENS UNDER FIVES
Charity number: 1076347

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tammy Gillard | Chair | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Vanzino | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karly Bunt | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zietel Carne | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMY LOWE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA ALISON MASTERS | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.