GARSTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
capacity building activities and support for community and voluntary organisations in the area of benefit acting as an umbrella organisation for groups, providing a focal point for taking up issues which will improve the quality of life, provides office facilities for local residents, a production base for a community newspaper. Provides a community centre for social and recreation activites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 16 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY LOVERING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Hewitt | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernard McNulty | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGERY REBECCA VERNON BLACK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.90k | £57.16k | £56.98k | £45.13k | £47.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.92k | £55.23k | £47.84k | £46.96k | £51.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £19.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £8.00k | £19.07k | £8.80k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 5TH FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GARSTON AND DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OF OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2. ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS 3. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
GARSTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wellington Street
Garston
Liverpool
L19 2LX
- Phone:
- 07702427266
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window