ROMSEY AND DISTRICT CARERS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports informal carers (that is people who have caring responsibilities for a family member, friend or neighbour) and the people they care for. Runs a number of projects e.g. carers cafe, community information cafe to achieve this support. Works in partnership with other local organisations to achieve best outcomes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 January 2000: Standard registration
- CARERS TOGETHER SOUTHERN TEST VA (Working name)
- ROMSEY CARERS FORUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE MEADER | Chair |
|
||||||||
Kenneth Raymond Meader | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Eldridge | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
David Walter Crocker | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
ANGELA DORIS BERNHARDT | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CAROL ANN LAMB | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71 | £55 | £1.37k | £0 | £16 | |
|
Total expenditure | £562 | £566 | £591 | £237 | £130 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS OF PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE AREA KNOWN AS SOUTHERN TEST VALLEY, WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT OR ILLNESS, OR INCAPACITY THROUGH OLD AGE. TO PROVIDE A FOCUS FOR CARERS ACROSS ALL GROUPS; TO PROMOTE THE NEEDS OF CARERS; TO GATHER AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION REGARDING CARERS AND SUPPORT FOR CARERS; TO IDENTIFY NEED AND WORK WITH AGENCIES TO DEVELOP APPROPRIATE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE AREA KNOWN AS SOUTHERN TEST VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LOVE LANE
ROMSEY
HAMPSHIRE
SO51 8DE
- Phone:
- 01794515126
- Email:
- admin@romseycarers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window