Trustees MENITHWOOD MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1075322
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID EVANS Chair
None on record
Neil Andrew Withey Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Michael Mockett Trustee 07 December 2022
None on record
Jackie Bradshaw Trustee 22 July 2021
None on record
Timothy Wood Trustee 29 November 2020
None on record
KEVIN GITTINS Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record
JENNY BUCKLEY Trustee
None on record
ROBERT DYSON Trustee
None on record
ANDREW WALFORD Trustee
None on record