Financial history OTTERY ST MARY MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity number: 1075296
Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £1.05k £750 £950 £738 £550
Total expenditure £1.48k £227 £227 £227 £227
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A