Governing document Inclusive Play Opportunities Project (IPOP)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/03/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/04/2012 as amended on 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:- (A) THE SUPPORT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 INCLUDING THOSE WITH A DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAY, RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND/OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (B) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, THEIR PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS. (C) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING TO THOSE PERSONS PROVIDING PLAY, RECREATION AND LEISURE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.