Accounts and annual returns 4SIGHT VISION SUPPORT

Charity number: 1075447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window