Dogfen lywodraethu KNOWSLEY DISABILITY CONCERN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS PRINCIPALLY WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF KNOWSLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR BY (I) PROVIDING EDUCATION SERVICES (II) PROVIDING ADVISORY AND SUPPORT SERVICES.
Maes buddion
FOR DISABLED RESIDENTS IN THE BOROUGH OF KNOWSLEY, MERSEYSIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.