Trustees NATIONAL DAY NURSERIES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1078275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Steel | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Dawson | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bowery | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Siddell | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Bonnar | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Anne Storey | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID AMBROSE POULSOM | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann McEwan | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Smyllie | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Haywood | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|||||
HELEN CLAIRE GRATION | Trustee | 04 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
COURTENEY ANN DONALDSON | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE VAUGHAN-PIPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TINA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL MOODY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.