Trustees KINGSTON CHURCHES ACTION ON HOMELESSNESS
Charity number: 1075890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Sutton | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Sansom | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lindsell | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gray Rigge | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Lack | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Orton | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BAILEY | Trustee | 11 November 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.