BRIDGWATER YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1076434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.81m £3.76m £4.91m £6.14m £6.79m
Total expenditure £3.25m £3.72m £4.72m £5.93m £6.74m
Income from government contracts £812.88k £932.13k £1.30m £1.22m £1.06m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £235.00k £277.96k £525.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £1.93k £21.85k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £2.96k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.81m £3.76m £4.91m £5.84m £6.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £536 £72 £9 £32 £328
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £278.72k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.10m £3.72m £4.72m £5.89m £6.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £154.00k £0 £0 £41.73k £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £23.20k £23.51k £48.10k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £154.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.31k £0