ANGOLAN AFRICAN CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 February 2020 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2019 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required