Accounts and annual returns BRADVILLE HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1076247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 11 March 2020 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 14 January 2019 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 23 April 2018 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 28 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window