Accounts and annual returns Mending Injured Minds

Charity number: 1076138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 May 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 May 2018 111 days late Download Open in new window