Financial history Mending Injured Minds

Charity number: 1076138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £156.79k £145.64k £155.99k £156.50k £159.63k
Total expenditure £156.34k £158.60k £155.75k £155.19k £173.16k
Income from government contracts £123.40k £0 £91.90k £91.90k £88.97k
Income from government grants £0 £105.30k £23.40k £23.40k £44.84k