Accounts and annual returns WILDLIFELINE

Charity number: 1075441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2022 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 July 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 October 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required