DONCASTER PARTNERSHIP FOR CARERS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide advocacy, advice, information, emotional/practical support,social activities and training to all unpaid carers and their families in Doncaster and volunteering opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,862 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 12 May 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Elizabeth Harlington | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Osborne | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD ROUNTHWAITE | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.78k | £56.66k | £43.95k | £99.75k | £84.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.67k | £39.89k | £48.87k | £79.09k | £82.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.50k | £17.50k | £55.36k | £61.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME IN DONCASTER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES AND THE PROMOTION OF THE NEEDS OF CARERS.
Area of benefit
DONCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 REGENT TERRACE (GROUND FLOOR)
DONCASTER
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
DN1 2EE
- Phone:
- 01302637566
- Email:
- dpfc@doncastercarers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window