Accounts and annual returns WOODROFFE BENTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1075272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 December 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 December 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window