PRAXIS COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1078945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.58m £1.60m £1.59m £1.90m £2.01m
Total expenditure £1.32m £1.44m £1.44m £1.60m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £6.82k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £47.18k £45.22k £102.03k £244.05k £466.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £192.69k £200.67k £193.24k £432.94k £243.51k
Income - Other trading activities £52.70k £3.92k £0 £0 £2.15k
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.40m £1.39m £1.47m £1.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £165 £34 £78 £212 £805
Income - Other £297.75k £0 £4.79k £1.66k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.44m £1.44m £1.59m £1.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.78k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.80k £12.47k £13.92k £14.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.50k £0