MID, WEST AND SOUTH WALES FIRE ENGINE PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continues as it always has done.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2004: Standard registration
- THE PRESERVATION GROUP (Working name)
- MID AND WEST WALES FIRE BRIGADE PRESERVATION GROUP (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GARY LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BRINGLOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER LYNN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £900 | £900 | £500 | £800 | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.55k | £876 | £896 | £936 | £946 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 12 JANUARY 2009.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN, RECORD AND RETAIN EXAMPLES OF FIREFIGHTING VEHICLES, APPLIANCES, EQUIPMENT AN ARTIFACTS ASSOCIATED WITH FIREFIGHTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF FIREFIGHTING. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO ASPECTS OF FIRE SAFETY AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 PLAS NEWYDD
GROVESEND
SWANSEA
SA4 4WN
- Phone:
- 01792215872
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window