KENT COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1077438
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/02/1999 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR REFUGEES, MIGRANTS ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN KENT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH REFUGEES, MIGRANTS AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF REFUGEES, MIGRANTS ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN WHICH THEY LIVE IN ORDER TO ASSIST THE INCLUSION OF REFUGEES, MIGRANTS, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 16 September 1999 : registered
  • 18 February 2020 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • KENT REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP (KRSG)_ (Working name)
  • KRSG (Working name)
  • KENT REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body