C T AND H E ROBINSON CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE CARIB AND LOKONO ARAWAK INDIANS

Charity number: 1075823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required