Accounts and annual returns THE KING'S SCHOOL, GLOUCESTER

Charity number: 1080641
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 14 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 July 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 July 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window