STAR (STUDENT ACTION FOR REFUGEES)

Charity number: 1079042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natasha Mary Jane Murphy Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record
Karolina Joksaite Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Edward Laurence Arnold Trustee 24 November 2018 None on record
JAMES OSBORNE Trustee
NATIONAL UGLY MUGS Received: On time
THE CAPSTAN TRUST Received: On time
David Michael Garratt Chair 09 November 2014 None on record
Maryam Taher Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
Billie Dibb Trustee 23 November 2019 None on record