Trustees SPURGEONS
Charity number: 1081182

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Victor Rebeiro | Chair | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Neal Jones | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Mark Elwell-Sutton | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Emery | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elijah William Kirby | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John John Buchan | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Clare Collins | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rayner | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Michelle Yolanda Brissett | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul James | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Emery | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Green | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH POWLEY | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.