Governance COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 27 August 1999: Standard registration
  • 16 August 2021: Funds received from 1163757 LIFEPOINT CHURCH, ROOKSDOWN
  • 17 November 2021: Funds received from 1177381 ENCOUNTER HOUSE (ESSEX)
  • 07 March 2023: Funds received from 1133263 GLO-BLESS
  • 09 May 2023: Funds received from 1139191 MECI UK
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COMPASSION UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property