YOUTHSCAPE

Charity number: 1081754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.15m £1.02m £1.06m £1.16m £1.21m
Total expenditure £791.39k £1.06m £1.06m £1.15m £1.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.01m £830.96k £751.46k £837.84k £902.61k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £137.17k £190.07k £311.26k £323.99k £303.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £81 £14 £38 £177 £224
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £778.61k £1.06m £1.06m £1.14m £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.78k £0 £3.57k £3.52k £5.82k
Expenditure - Governance £31.49k £46.56k £34.24k £32.73k £25.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0