Accounts and annual returns RADBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1075696
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window