Financial history RADBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1075696
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £29.20k £27.05k £29.20k £2.80k £20.59k
Total expenditure £29.89k £28.35k £30.55k £23.14k £15.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A