Financial history WOODSETTS VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1076158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.98k £6.43k £7.33k £10.70k £5.73k
Total expenditure £5.81k £6.33k £5.99k £5.84k £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A