THE SHRIMALA TRUST

Charity number: 1078783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 21 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 13 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download