THE SHRIMALA TRUST

Charity number: 1078783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £180.61k £191.50k £151.63k £164.62k £176.17k
Total expenditure £159.87k £159.73k £164.30k £153.51k £154.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A