ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION DONCASTER BRANCH

Charity number: 1075483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.18k £11.17k £5.49k £5.22k £808
Total expenditure £9.84k £8.04k £7.93k £5.62k £493
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A