COMMUNICATION WORKERS UNION HUMANITARIAN AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CWUHA AIMS TO DELIVER ANY MATERIAL OR AID DIRECT TO THE NEEDY OR TO A RESPONSIBLLE AUTHORITY OR ORGANISATION AT THE END DESTINATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hungary
- Lithuania
- Moldova
- Syria
- Tanzania
Governance
- 22 November 1999: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 July 2010: Standard registration
- CWU HUMANITARIAN AID (Working name)
- CWUHA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARL WEBB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rebecca Crook | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Hudson Hudson | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Newsham Newsham | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Webb | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LENNY CROOK | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE ALBON | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEX PEARSON | Trustee | 09 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACK CHAMBERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICK KIRKBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA VOLLANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER VINCENT SHARROCKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.02k | £26.25k | £51.69k | £117.00k | £43.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.68k | £21.42k | £31.12k | £133.77k | £39.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 293 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2024 | 293 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED 21 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN AID
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
C W U
302a Barlow Moor Road
Manchester
M21 8AY
- Phone:
- 01618819450
- Email:
- northwestregion@cwu.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window