Financial history MIDLANDS ETHNIC ALBANIAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079774
Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £800 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A