THE TELLUS MATER FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The directors intend to focus on providing grants to forward-thinking charitable organisations with cutting-edge ideas that will change the rules of the game. Supporting leaders to put in place a low impact future, the directors seek charitable organisations with innovative solutions to shift political, economic, and financial institutions to a sustainable path.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- United States
Governance
- 20 August 1999: Standard registration
- THE JAMES ARBIB CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bengt Henrik Olof Olsen | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ASHLEY ARBIB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.88k | £110.91k | £339.32k | £62.93k | £61.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £978.80k | £914.37k | £1.03m | £723.12k | £1.95m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1999 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 31 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR SUPPORT ANY CHARITY SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES AND, WITHOUT LIMITATION, IT IS EXPRESSLY CONTEMPLATED THAT THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE ARBIB FOUNDATION MAY BE THE BENEFICIARY OF THE APPLICATION OF ANY OR ALL FUNDS OR OTHER BENEFITS BY THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 GROSVENOR STREET
LONDON
W1K 3JE
- Phone:
- 02030111100
- Email:
- info@tellusmater.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window