LINKS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons with mental health problems by providing training and work opportunities in a supportive community environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 26 August 1999: Standard registration
- 06 May 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 May 2011: Funds transferred to 1139855 LYNX WORKSHOP
- LYNX WORKSHOPS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.10k | £66.21k | £70.55k | £95.63k | £97.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.19k | £84.51k | £90.56k | £90.56k | £88.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 February 2011 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 01 February 2011 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 27 May 2010 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 2 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND WORK RELATED OPPORTUNITIES IN A SUPPORTIVE COMMUNITY ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
LLANELLI AND AMMANFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window