Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES'S CHURCH, MUSWELL HILL

Charity number: 1075986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A