HOLLY LODGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1076741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download