EAST SUSSEX MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1076180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2021 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 August 2021 572 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 August 2021 578 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required