ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF HEYTESBURY KNOOK AND TYTHERINGTON CHURCHES

Charity number: 1083252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 February 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 February 2020 106 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required