ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF HEYTESBURY KNOOK AND TYTHERINGTON CHURCHES

Charity number: 1083252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £12.09k £9.05k £6.66k £74.48k £7.74k
Total expenditure £6.03k £16.38k £10.50k £70.92k £22.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A