Accounts and annual returns VICTORY VISION

Charity number: 1078988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 11 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 10 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 07 January 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required