Financial history VICTORY VISION

Charity number: 1078988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £2.65k £2.74k £1.65k £499 £2.02k
Total expenditure £2.92k £2.71k £3.46k £455 £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A