MID MEDIATION AND COUNSELLING LTD

Charity number: 1076166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Kempner Trustee 10 December 2014 None on record
ANTHONY JOHN SPIRO Trustee 27 September 2011
THE ASSOCIATION OF JEWISH REFUGEES (AJR) Received: On time
THE FREUD MUSEUM LONDON Received: On time
THE MARGARETHE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
JILL TRELFA Trustee None on record
Clare Deborah Kirby Trustee 15 April 2019 None on record
Gillian Fogg Trustee 12 December 2016 None on record
TIMOTHY NIGEL JENKINS Trustee None on record
SALLY KEMMIS-BETTY Trustee None on record
Helen Elisse Jones Trustee 10 February 2020
CLAYGATE RECREATION GROUND TRUST Received: On time