Financial history BEREFT

Charity number: 1077140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £35.29k £48.30k £54.29k £47.85k £51.49k
Total expenditure £34.87k £44.16k £44.84k £45.83k £38.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £13.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.20k £10.00k N/A N/A