Accounts and annual returns PHOENIX FUN CLUB

Charity number: 1077459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 27 September 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 September 2021 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 672 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 January 2018 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 January 2018 147 days late Download Open in new window