Financial history PHOENIX FUN CLUB

Charity number: 1077459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £32.96k £34.50k £43.73k £48.00k £4.92k
Total expenditure £28.99k £33.33k £37.98k £41.23k £41.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A